U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00282
  • Case Name: Provost v. Jack
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 04, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 22, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 11, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.