U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Weems Industries, Inc v. Flexon Industries Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 19, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Withdraw]
  • February 18, 2020: [Default Entry]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2019: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.