U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Kaercher v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 12, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.