U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:91-cv-10096
  • Case Name: USA v. ACC Chemical Company, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • September 10, 2019: [Mail Returned]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment - Consent]
  • August 27, 2019: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.