U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Carolina Casualty, Ins. Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 06, 2019: [Reply]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 02, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • October 01, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 26, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2019: [Leave]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.