U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Johnson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.