U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Newport v. Payton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Stay]
  • January 12, 2022: [Stay]
  • January 10, 2022: [Documents Sent]
  • January 07, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • December 08, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 05, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • September 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 12, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Documents Sent]
  • December 17, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 05, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 14, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 22, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 22, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.