U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Admire v. Wal-Mart Supercenter #1621 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Closing Documents]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 22, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.