U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Armstrong v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice - Other]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 04, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 04, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • July 23, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.