U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00227
  • Case Name: Utecht v. Monsanto Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 01, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 24, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.