U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Iowa Libertarian Party et al v. Celsi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 10, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2020: [Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Stay]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 11, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 24, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • September 23, 2019: [Leave]
  • September 23, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 05, 2019: [Strike]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 24, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.