U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Lajeunesse v. Sperflage
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • May 26, 2020: [Reconsideration]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Stay]
  • October 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stay]
  • October 15, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 26, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • July 26, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.