U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haulk, et. al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • August 06, 2019: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 30, 2019: [Continue Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention]
  • July 26, 2019: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.