U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02041
  • Case Name: Fialkoff et al v. VGM Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Quash]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Compel]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 26, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.