U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Shanahan v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 26, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 24, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • October 28, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 29, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 29, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.