U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Miller v. Gibbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 23, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
  • February 19, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
  • October 09, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 03, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 30, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.