U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Byrd v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 14, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 14, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Brief /Other]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 05, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 25, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • March 25, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 23, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 22, 2019: [Errata]
  • October 22, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 22, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 30, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.