U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Carlson v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Reply]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 08, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.