U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Devoll v. U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [Stay]
  • December 10, 2019: [Stay]
  • December 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Affidavit]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.