U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Anzivino v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • February 03, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 18, 2019: [Brief /Other]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 07, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.