U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Iowa Libertarian Party et al v. Pate
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sealed Document]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 18, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: [Affidavit]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 29, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 02, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.