U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Shanahan v. Texas Roadhouse Management Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 22, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Staying Case]
  • January 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 06, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 06, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.