U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Comstock v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 26, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • September 10, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 10, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.