U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00248
  • Case Name: Vale v. Gill et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 14, 2020: [Closing Documents]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 06, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.