U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00249
  • Case Name: Fulk v. Muscatine County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 19, 2020: [Recusal]
  • May 18, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Recusal]
  • May 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2019: [Brief /Other]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Brief /Other]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 17, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.