U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Real Estate Equities Development LLC et al v. Village Cooperative of Crow Creek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 31, 2019: [Compel]
  • December 31, 2019: [Reconsideration]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice - Other]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 22, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 16, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Compel]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Leave]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 18, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 09, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 05, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.