U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00055
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Real Property located at 471 Draper Valley Road, Selma, Oregon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • December 27, 2019: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 12, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 06, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.