U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Pagel v. ISN Software Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 22, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2020: [Closing Documents]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 16, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 13, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 13, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • October 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 09, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 09, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 17, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 17, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 17, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 04, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 01, 2020: [Errata]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 31, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2020: [Leave]
  • February 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 12, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • December 11, 2019: [Leave]
  • December 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 09, 2019: [Declaration]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.