U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Newell v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 11, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.