U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Bigge v. Singh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 13, 2020: [Closing Documents]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Status Report]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 04, 2019: [Certificate]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 14, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 11, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 14, 2019: [Errata]
  • August 14, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.