open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

IOWA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00069-1
    Party Name:USA v. Garwood
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition/Resistance (Seal doc optional)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief - Other]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Deadline]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial - Davenport Case]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibits Receipt]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Trial]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.iasd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69059
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =