U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00254
  • Case Name: White v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 20, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • March 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.