U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04045
  • Case Name: Hunt v. Principal Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Case Ready for Decision]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 06, 2020: [Seal Document]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Expedite]
  • January 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.