U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-01018
  • Case Name: American Lady Cruises, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.