U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00256
  • Case Name: Rowe et al v. Reynolds et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Substitute Party]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 03, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice - Other]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Certify Class]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 28, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2020: [Certify Class]
  • December 09, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Certify Class]
  • November 05, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2020: [Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 12, 2020: [Leave]
  • October 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 04, 2020: [Certify Class]
  • September 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 11, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 14, 2019: [Errata]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.