U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Biggart v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 07, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Mail Returned]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 28, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.