U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Alvarado v. Gardner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • June 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Extension of Time]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 15, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.