U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Finn v. Syneos Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 13, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 25, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • September 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 16, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 15, 2019: [Statement]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.