U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03039
  • Case Name: Greenwood v. Trans Union LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 03, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 21, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.