U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Jonathan Alan Stein v. Wild Rose Entertainment, LLLP. et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 01, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 25, 2019: [Joinder]
  • September 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice - Other]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.