U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Glassgow v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.