U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services, L.L.C. v. Naval Coating, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 02, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 02, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2019: [Default Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • October 16, 2019: [Writ]
  • October 15, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 07, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 26, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • September 20, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 22, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.