U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Bertelsen v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 10, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 27, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • December 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 29, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2019: [Complaint]
  • August 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.