U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Deaton v. Posey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.