U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00254
  • Case Name: Manning v. Ryan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 05, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 27, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 26, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.