U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00265
  • Case Name: Bailey v. Accident Fund National Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 17, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Status Report]
  • February 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 06, 2020: [Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Errata]
  • November 15, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 12, 2019: [Remand]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2019: [Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • September 23, 2019: [Remand]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.