U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Sheri Johnson, et al v. John Doe, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.