U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Conaway v. Brightstar CRDM, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 13, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 19, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.