U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02037
  • Case Name: Kim v. University of Northern Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 27, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.