U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Dixon et al v. United States of America et al See order at #32 when entering judgment
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 28, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.